Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ferlazzo, Salvatore D., Langlois, Christopher P, Manfredo, Robert F, against David M. Puglisi, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2014SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | EXECUTION | |
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.