Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against John W. Terry, Maria T. Terry, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time423 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT dated 03/30/2015 john |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Dated 03/30/15 Maria |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOD dated 03/17/2015 |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.