Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mohammad Wady, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pautz, Daniel John, against Shanker Tolani, represented by Lamendola, Joseph Edward, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time522 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2014ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: September 17, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 07, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 25, 2014COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 27, 2014REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: May 13, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Amended Counterclaims |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Verified answer and discovery demand |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to Ver. Amended Complaint |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Ver. Amended Complaint |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Verified Amended Complaint |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Ack of Service of Process |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.