Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of Syracuse, filed a(n) Other Special Proceeding case represented by Mclees Craner, Meghan P, Ryan, Meghan E., against Harryram Boodram, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with James C Tormey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryOther Special Proceeding |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time51 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 19, 2015PETITION
Date: December 29, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: December 29, 2014DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT
Date: March 12, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 31, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 31, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 12, 2015 | DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT | ||
February 19, 2015 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 19, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Discontinued Tormey (Court Activity) Judge: Tormey, Hon. James C. |
|
February 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) Tormey (Motion Part) Judge: Tormey, Hon. James C. |
|
February 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Tormey (Motion Part) Judge: Tormey, Hon. James C. |
|
January 21, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Tormey (Motion Part) Judge: Tormey, Hon. James C. |
|
January 13, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.