Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis-Moriarty, Joelle Susan, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Moriarty, Thomas Edward, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Ortiz, Devon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order 928130-Order: Permanent Rest. Order Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner ORDER: PERMANENT REST. ORDER [928130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing; Davis-Moriarty, J. vs. Moriarty, T. Motion OSC Details: 911220 - Domestic Violence ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion 922210-Motion; Davis-Moriarty, J. vs. Moriarty, T. Motion OSC Details: 911290 - Other ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Additional Info : Property Retention Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 22 2007 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 942110 - After Hearing |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion 922210-Motion; Davis-Moriarty, J. vs. Moriarty, T. Motion OSC Details: 911290 - Other ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Additional Info : Property Retention Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment 937910-Mediation Appointment; Davis-Moriarty, J. vs. Moriarty, T. ; Judge: FL0008 Ortiz Devon Judge: Ortiz, Devon |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By RESPONDENT PRO PER [911320] |
|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion 912710-Motion Motion/OSC Detail: 211290 - Other Add'l Description: Property Retention Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per MOTION [912710] Motion: OTHER [211290] Additional Description : Filed By RESPONDENT PRO PER [911320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.