Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
T'S Wireless Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by O'Malley, Brady John, against Ben Walsh, City Of Syracuse, Jake Dishaw, represented by Long, Todd Michael, Pires, Danielle Biasone, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with James P Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Otsc For Tro) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by T's Wireless, LLC against the City of Syracuse and Jake Dishaw. T's Wireless is seeking injunctive relief and declaratory judgment based on the City's alleged unlawful actions. T's Wireless operates as a retail store sellin...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 14, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: October 24, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #1*)
Date: October 24, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1*)
Date: October 23, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: October 19, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 |
NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal |
||
November 17, 2023 |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal |
||
November 17, 2023 |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI) Notice of Removal as filed with the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal |
||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.