Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mariner Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gitlin, Robert Brian, against Patrick A. Thurston, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A CONTRACT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 23, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 23, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2022EXECUTION
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
May 12, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CONTRACT Redacted per 22 NYCRR CONTRACT Redacted |
||
March 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
March 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILING |
||
March 23, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACT | ||
January 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 29, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.