Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Destiny Usa Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Naughton, J Michael, against Jerrid Douglas, Kenny Lee, Neil Patel, Nirav Patel, Sandi Ventures Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Conway, Michael T, Forte, Stephen M, Grimm, Richard A., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Robert E Antonacci presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: June 09, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: June 09, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 09, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: April 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 05, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 03, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 20, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 15, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 15, 2021APPENDIX Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 15, 2021ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 14, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 14, 2021SUMMONS
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: June 09, 2021ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: December 22, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 30, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: December 22, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
January 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 03, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Robert E. Antonacci II, J.S.C. |
||
September 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Amended Complaint |
||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation of S. Forte |
||
September 20, 2021 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Memorandum of Law in further support of Motion to Dismiss |
||
September 15, 2021 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint |
||
September 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Naughton Ex. C - Email exchange between counsel |
||
September 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit of J. Michael Naughton in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.