Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kristen Catanzaro, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Cerio, Scott David, against Associates For Women'S Medicine, Pllc, Fadi Makhlouf Md, St. Joseph'S Hospital Health Center, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Danielle M Fogel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDanielle M Fogel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 19, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 19, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 16, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2021LETTER ROGATORY - ( REQUEST FOR SIGNATURE )
Date: March 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 12, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 31, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 29, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: January 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: January 19, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 31, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 14, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
December 13, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 11, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
March 10, 2022 | LETTER ROGATORY - ( REQUEST FOR SIGNATURE ) | ||
February 16, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 05, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 24, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
July 28, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT A conference has been scheduled for August 31, 2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.