Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc D B A Jh Capital Group, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Susan Scalise, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Anthony J Paris presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions357 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time378 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAVS963327 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 29, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 24, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2018STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: February 27, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Return Date (Motion #001) Paris (Motion Part) Judge: Paris, Hon. Anthony J. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Paris (Motion Part) Judge: Paris, Hon. Anthony J. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Paris (Court Activity) Judge: Paris, Hon. Anthony J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.