Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Christopher R Shelmerdine, Mary Shelmerdine, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gonsalves, Jeanne Marie, against Fuccillo Automotive Group, Inc., Fuccillo Nissan, Inc., Wbf Properties Xii, Llc, represented by Abelson Liebman, Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fall Down) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: May 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
September 08, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Via NYSCEF |
||
September 08, 2022 |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
||
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
August 18, 2021 |
SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons |
||
August 17, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.