Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Kevin Lasher, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 19, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: January 21, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 19, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 19, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract Redacted |
||
January 19, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 19, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing a Copy of the Summons | ||
January 19, 2022 | Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status | ||
January 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Search |
||
January 19, 2022 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
July 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 30, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.