Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tylor L Cuppernell, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shannon, Thomas Francis, against Christen Lothridge, Kaitlin J. Lothridge, represented by Fletcher, Daniel Peter, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Deborah H Karalunas presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management412 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time760 days |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2017RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 11, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 31, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 05, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 21, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 02, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 01, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 17, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 05, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 04, 2018ANSWER
Date: October 11, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Karalunas (Trial Part)
Judge: Karalunas, Hon. Deborah H. |
|
June 21, 2019 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 02, 2019 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Post-Settled Before Trial Karalunas (Court Activity) Judge: Karalunas, Hon. Deborah H. |
|
April 16, 2019 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT trial scheduled for 09/30/19 |
||
April 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Karalunas (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Karalunas, Hon. Deborah H. |
|
April 01, 2019 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT conference schedule 04/16/19 |
||
March 14, 2019 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Karalunas (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Karalunas, Hon. Deborah H. |
|
February 05, 2019 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT A Pretrial Conference is scheduled for March 14, 2019. |
||
February 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Karalunas (Court Activity) Judge: Karalunas, Hon. Deborah H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.