Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Larson, Nancy Jean, against Telisa Givens, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions377 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time377 days |
STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: December 27, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2017JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: September 12, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 07, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 26, 2017AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: September 12, 2018NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 31, 2017SUMMONS WITH NOTICE 17 08 28 SWN Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 31, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: September 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT 18 12 18 Stipulation Vacating Judgment |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 11 07 AOSM |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY 18 11 01 NOE |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 18 08 31 JMT |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 18 08 31 AOR |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION 18 08 31 AONMS |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 17 10 11 AOS |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 17 10 25 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE AUTHORIZATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.