Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Earlene A Kreiger, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bruffett, David Charles, against Shaw Kreiger, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Martha E Mulroy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartha E Mulroy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 10, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 24, 2023 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
May 15, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
May 12, 2023 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
May 12, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 10, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.