Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Christine M Goldman, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Grainger, Michael Patrick, against Geico General Insurance Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Inc., Geico Insurance Agency, Inc., represented by Savage, Joseph William, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Danielle M Fogel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 28, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 10, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 10, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 28, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 23, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 01, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 23, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 23, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: November 15, 2022NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 11, 2023 |
NOTICE ADR Conf. at 12:30pm on 01/25/23 |
||
November 15, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
August 23, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: NOTICE TO PRODUCE |
||
August 23, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter SO ORDER PROPOSED to the Judge re Dates |
||
August 23, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Discovery by 10/30/22, NOI by 11/15/22, ADR 1/25/23 |
||
August 17, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Virtual Conference Scheduled on 8/23/22 |
||
August 17, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge re CONFERENCE REQUEST |
||
February 28, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 28, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference Scheduled on 2/28/22; Blank Proposed Scheduling Order Attached |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.