Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Bridget R. Mailloux, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Haab, Galen Frederick, against Raymond A. Mailloux, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Martha E Mulroy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartha E Mulroy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 10, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
May 09, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 09, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 05, 2023 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
May 05, 2023 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 05, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 04, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 30, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.