Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marianna H.P. Kaufman, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Underwood, Michael Evan, against Andrew R. Kaufman, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts Onondaga County Supreme Court with Robert E Antonacci presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 11, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
|
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions99 days |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseOnondaga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time107 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.