Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Alan R Verrette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Drumm, Andrea Culebras, against Martha E Wiltsie, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Martha E Mulroy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartha E Mulroy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 17, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 13, 2023 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
April 13, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
April 10, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 10, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 03, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.