Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Destiny Usa Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Naughton, J Michael, against Old Navy, Llc, represented by Epstein, Joshua H., Karram, Zachary George, Schneider, Jesse B, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: February 12, 2021SUMMONS
Date: February 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: February 12, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 12, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 12, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 29, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with prejudice and without costs |
||
March 29, 2021 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
March 29, 2021 |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaims |
||
March 18, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Defendant Old Navy LLC's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim |
||
February 17, 2021 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service in New York Secretary of State as agent for Old Navy, LLC |
||
February 12, 2021 | Complaint | ||
February 12, 2021 | Summons | ||
February 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Ex. 4 - Past Due Rent Calculation |
||
February 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Ex. 1 - Charge Schedule Abstract dated December 9, 2019 |
||
February 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Ex. 3 - Notice of Default, dated January 27, 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.