Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bankers Healthcare Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cali, Christopher James, against Bursnall Business Llc, Christopher W Bursnall, Felicia A Bursnall, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
May 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 13, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/CHRISTOPHER W. BURSNALL |
||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ BURSNALL BUSINESS LLC |
||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/FELICIA A BURSNALL |
||
May 07, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled S&C Mailing Affidavit-CHRISTOPHER W. BURSNALL -47472500 |
||
May 07, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
March 19, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
February 11, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
February 11, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-B Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR Prom Note, Security Agreement, Personal Guaranty, Demand Letter Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.