Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Justice M Baker, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cobb, Charles Harrison, against Amber M Egelston, City Of Rome, Matthew J Rivera, represented by Walsh, David Henry, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Louis P Gigliotti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouis P Gigliotti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint, filed in the Supreme Court of Oneida County, New York, involves Justice M. Baker suing Matthew J. Rivera, Amber M. Egelston, and the City of Rome for negligence. The incident occurred when Rivera, with Egelston's permission, was drivi...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01) 50-h Transcript of Claimant Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 16, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 16, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01) Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 16, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #01) 50-h Transcript of Claimant Redacted per 22 NYCRR 50-h Transcript of Claimant Redacted |
||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #01) State Routes in Oneida County |
||
January 16, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 16, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01) Affirmation of Joseph Guiliano |
||
January 16, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01) Attorney Affirmation of David H. Walsh, Esq. |
||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Notice of Claim |
||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR Police Report Redacted |
||
January 16, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) Defendant CITY OF ROME'S Notice of Motion |
||
January 15, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of City of Rome |
||
January 15, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Matthew Rivera |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.