Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stanislaus, Brandon Glenn, against Dale Goggin Aka Dale A Goggin, represented by Rowe, Stephanie Louise, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This legal document is a complaint filed by American Express National Bank against Dale Goggin, also known as Dale A. Goggin. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant entered into a credit agreement and subsequently defaulted on the terms. The total ...
ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 07, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
January 04, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
January 04, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Credit Statement |
||
December 07, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Dale Goggin aka Dale A Goggin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.