Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sergey Gurin, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Lieberman, Scott, against Utica Municipal Housing Authority D B A People First, represented by Miller, Frank William, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Macrae presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick F Macrae Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - NA
Date: December 01, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - NA
Date: December 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 13, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: March 24, 2022PETITION
Date: October 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Oral Argument & Decision 12/07/2021 |
||
December 13, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 13, 2021 | Affidavit of Service | ||
December 09, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01) Order - Motion #1 |
||
December 06, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
December 06, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting adjournment of Motion scheduled for 12/7/21 |
||
December 06, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01) In response to Respondent's 12/6/21 letter (Doc #16) |
||
December 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bates Stamped documents of the Record |
||
December 01, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
December 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - NA Records submitted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.