Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
In Re The Matter Of And Application For Court Approval Of The Sale And Transfer Of Certain Structured Settlement Payment Rights Of R L Pursuant To And In Accordance With Gen Oblig Law 5 1701 Et Seq, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, against None, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Macrae presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sale/Transfer) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
PETITION
Date: March 16, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 20, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #01)
Date: May 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-E Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 20, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01) Order - Motion #1 |
||
June 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
June 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-E (Motion #01) Un-Redacted Exhibits |
||
May 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Decision/Order |
||
May 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #01) Decision/Order |
||
May 20, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
May 18, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #01) Motion rescheduled to June 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by Teams. |
||
March 25, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #01) Order To Show Cause - Motion #1, ret. 5-25-21 at 10:00 a.m. |
||
March 16, 2021 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.