Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anthony J Reiling, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sossen, R. Robert, against Samarri J Thomas, represented by Hanson, Paul Gerard, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts Oneida County Supreme Court with Bernadette T Clark presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 13, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseOneida County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time290 days |
ANSWER
Date: November 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: January 28, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: January 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: January 28, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 29, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #01) good faith letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.