Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against David Kowalczik, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time77 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 18, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF
Date: December 01, 2017SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2017JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 01, 2017SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: December 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 19, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
December 04, 2017 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 01, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
December 01, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
December 01, 2017 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 01, 2017 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 01, 2017 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 01, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
October 03, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DAVID KOWALCZIK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.