Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citifinancial Company D B A Citifinancial Company De, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Greene, Jeffrey S, against Elaine M Bartlett A K A Elaine Bartlett, Michael D Bartlett A K A Michael Bartlett, Oneida Healthcare Center, Oneida Savings Bank, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Bernadette T Clark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: September 10, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: July 25, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 10, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: July 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Â (Motion #02)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 09, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
September 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #02) | ||
September 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 26, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #02) Purchaser Agreement and mortgage loan schedule lisitng |
||
July 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #02) Client Affidavit in Support |
||
July 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #02) Summons, Complaint with exhibits including note, mortgage, pre-foreclosure notices and three lis pen Summons, Complaint with exhibits including note, mortgage, pre-foreclosure notices and three lis pen ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.