Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Betsy Ross Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, Inc. D B A Betsy Ross Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Derrick, Richard Edward, against Michael Reeves Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of Sophie Reeves, Michael Reeves Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of Sophie Reeves, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 16, 2021JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2021SUMMONS
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
September 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of Service- Additional Mailing |
||
September 21, 2021 | Affidavit of Service | ||
June 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 07, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
June 07, 2021 | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.