Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Helems, Sandy, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Knox, John, Weir, Marva L., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Time To Trial71 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time127 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction 714130-Judgment: Satisfaction Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION [714130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 714320-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: FILED [714320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 714310-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: ISSUED [714310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 713710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [713710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued 722110-Abstract Issued Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per ABSTRACT ISSUED [722110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order 714210-Order Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk ORDER [714210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 712820-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ANSWER [712820] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request 714810-Request Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per REQUEST [714810] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) 714120-Judgment: Notice of Entry Filed/Issued By: JUDGMENT: NOTICE OF ENTRY [714120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 713310-Declaration Add'l Description: small claims address form Filed/Issued By: DECLARATION [713310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.