Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stanislaus, Brandon Glenn, Verhagen, Jason P, against Ellen R Young, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Discover Bank against Ellen R Young. Discover Bank is the plaintiff in this case, and Ellen R Young is the defendant. The complaint alleges that Ellen R Young entered into a credit agreement with Discover B...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: January 15, 2024ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: December 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 21, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 15, 2024 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
December 20, 2023 |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) Additional Mailing - Mailed 12/21/2023 |
||
November 30, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 29, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 29, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 21, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Credit Statement |
||
November 21, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Ellen R Young |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.