Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Montero, Christhie Maria, against John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Keybank National Association, Krystal M. Kreger, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Di Caro, John A, Sroka, Scott Leeson, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts with Paula L Feroleto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: November 09, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 09, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 21, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
December 21, 2022 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCRJI |
||
December 21, 2022 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 21, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KRYSTAL M. KREGER- RJI MAILING |
||
December 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KRYSTAL M. KREGER |
||
December 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN LACY SHA JOHN DOE #1 1303 MAILING |
||
December 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN LACY SHA JOHN DOE #1 |
||
December 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303 MAILING |
||
December 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KRYSTAL M. KREGER 3215 MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.