Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Richard J. Nye Ii, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 14, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: September 14, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: September 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #1) attorney fee provision and time log Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
September 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 08, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
August 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) court notice |
||
August 02, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) S&C, AOS, AOM, AOF, military verification |
||
August 02, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) attorney fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.