Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tripifoods, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gottlieb, Warren S, against Anthony Pavlock, Chapman'S Market, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 21, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
October 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 21, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 10, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.