Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lucy Kerr And William Kerr, As Wife And Husband, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Viola, Robert, against Patricia Dusett, William Dusett, represented by Burgio, James Philip, Messina, Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 06, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 13, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 25, 2022ANSWER
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 06, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 22, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Amended |
||
November 22, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
September 13, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 06, 2021 | Demand for Bill of Particulars | ||
May 06, 2021 | Answer to Amended Complaint | ||
May 06, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of Deposition |
||
May 06, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands |
||
April 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.