Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
John W. Crawford Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Humann, Max Brian, against Robin E. Gardner, represented by Moriarity, Erin Melissa, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 03, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS *Corrected*
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 25, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT *Corrected*
Date: August 25, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 25, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3) Cardamone reprots. Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3) Certificate of Conviction Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3) Cardamone Chiropractic Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3) RES Medical 1 of 2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3) RES Medical 2 of 2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3) MV 104A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 25, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 20, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 13, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 10, 2023 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 28, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #3) Counterstatement of Material Facts |
||
November 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition/Reply Affirmation |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #3) Pinnacle Orthopedic Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Pinnacle Orthopedic Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
November 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Attorney Affirmation |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Defendant's deposition transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.