Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alan V. Ortman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Canepa, Joseph Anthony, against A&H Expediting Service, Inc., A&H Expediting Service, Inc., D B A Key Logistics, Diane M. Salisbury, Homer J. Bell, Mary E. Vanelli, (total of 5) See All represented by Condren, John Robert, Graff, Kevin Jay, Long, Nancy Anne, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time234 days |
ANSWER
Date: May 22, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 19, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 01, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 20, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 20, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 20, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 20, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Discontinued
Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED to Join for Discovery w/E170380/2019 and E170464/2019 |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
May 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Request for Supp. Demand, etc. |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Miscellaneous Disclosure Demands |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.