Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Amira Vines, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions220 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time221 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: August 06, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: July 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: July 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1)
Date: July 23, 2018EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: July 23, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT clerk stamped |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) *Corrected* | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Military Verification |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.