Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cheryl Kausner, Thomas Kausner, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fitzgerald, Brian P., against Andrew Cappuccino M.D., Buffalo Spine Surgery, Pllc, Eastern Niagara Hospital, Inc., Eastern Niagara Radiology And Nuclear Medicine Associates Pc, Eric Dean Rpa-C, (total of 8) See All represented by Cline, Kimberly Ann, Gruber, John Mark, Kroetsch, Bryan Paul, Larrabee, Christopher James, Mccarthy, Joseph Vincent, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank A Sedita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management143 days |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time1550 days |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 22, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 31, 2017ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 13, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 21, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 08, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 08, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 25, 2016NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 12, 2016SUMMONS
Date: September 12, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017APPENDIX Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 02, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars to ENH Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars to Lutnick Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: December 20, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: December 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 02, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2016NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 08, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #1) ENH's Response to First Notice to Produce Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #1) Plaintiffs' Verified BP to Clerks Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 06, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #1) Eastern Niagara Hospital Record Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 06, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 10, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 06, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 10, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3) EBT Transcript of Hany Fattouch MD Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4) Post Operative Anesthesia Record Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 10, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 27, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 04, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5) Plaintiffs' Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7) Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 07, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 14, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 08, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7) Medical record excerpts Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 24, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 09, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #9) Pollina, M.D. Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10) 012522 ltr to Judge Sedita Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10) Supplemented BP to Lutnick Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #9) Clerk, M.D., EBT Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 26, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10) Supplemental BP to Eastern Niagara Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: January 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #10)
Date: August 04, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #9) Levy, M.D. Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 26, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #8) Kuruvilla MD Consult Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8) 090215 MRI Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 31, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8) MRA Requisition Form Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 04, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: July 21, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 05, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #8) Pollina MD OR Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #8) ECMC Discharge Summary Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8) Expert Evaluation Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 04, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 04, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 25, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 14, 2017STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: June 22, 2017STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: June 22, 2017ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
September 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 31, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #11) Emails |
||
August 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
August 23, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
August 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #10) for inquiry as to potential conflict |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #10) 012522 ltr to Judge Sedita Redacted per 22 NYCRR 012522 ltr to Judge Sedita Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.