Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union -Od, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Brandilynn Ludlam, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Richard C. Kloch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: January 03, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 12, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: December 08, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: December 08, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 29, 2017ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1)
Date: December 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION Cortland Co Sheriff |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) | |
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Kloch (Court Activity) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 12/27/2016Decided Before Justice: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. Answer demanded: No Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.