Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Pet) case represented by Hamerman, Dina Leah, against Liberty Assignment Corporation, Liberty Life Assurance Company Of Boston, Shawn Edin, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Matthew J. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 07, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Pet) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time169 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: March 07, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 07, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 14, 2016RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 07, 2016PETITION
Date: March 07, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Murphy (Court Activity) Judge: Murphy III, Hon. Matthew J. |
|
August 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Murphy (Motion Part) Judge: Murphy III, Hon. Matthew J. |
|
April 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001) Murphy (Motion Part) Judge: Murphy III, Hon. Matthew J. |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 10, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 08/23/2016Decided Before Justice: Murphy III, Hon. Matthew J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Murphy III, Hon. Matthew J. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Murphy (Motion Part) Judge: Murphy III, Hon. Matthew J. |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.