Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fox, Christine L., Gallo, Deborah M, Nduka, Ijeoma O, against John Does And Jane Does, Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Have Claim Or May Claim A Lien Against, Or Other Interest In The Premises, Staci A Licht, Timothy J Licht, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time665 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 23, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2017ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | |
December 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
December 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
December 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification Conference Part (Court Activity) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1) signed and granted |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
November 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
November 02, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 12/06/2017Decided Before Justice: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.