Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kimberly Funke, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mosher, Matthew Thomas, against Ann Giglia, represented by Weber, Cory John, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management835 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Time To Trial939 days |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
August 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
June 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
April 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
September 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
June 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.