Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against City Of Lockport New York, A Municipal Corporation, Dawn Weber A K A Dawn M. Weber, Gregory Weber, Krista Mt Pleasant, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 24, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions482 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 17, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 10, 2016JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2)
Date: October 18, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 10, 2016ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 10, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: October 18, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: June 10, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 16, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 10, 2016MEMORANDUM
Date: November 29, 2017ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3)
Date: August 14, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #3)
Date: May 17, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM Terms of Sale and Memorandum of Sale |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Report of Sale, Statement, and Receipt |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
August 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Appointing Successor Referee |
|
June 01, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 08/14/2017Decided Before Justice: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK Answer demanded: No Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
June 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.