Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against Asset Acceptance Llc, Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Fia Card Services, N.A., David M. Czerwinski, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Katherine L. Czerwinski, (total of 6) See All represented by Roach, Mary Keefe, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions347 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time347 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: September 07, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 04, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: June 16, 2016ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2015EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: July 07, 2015ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #4)
Date: October 12, 2016ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4)
Date: September 07, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2)
Date: November 12, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: June 16, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: February 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #4) Signed Order |
|
October 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #004) Montour (Motion Part) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
October 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #004) Montour (Motion Part) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
September 09, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #004) Decided: 10/12/2016Decided Before Justice: Montour, Hon. Mark A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
September 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #004) Montour (Motion Part) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.