Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Professional Collection Consultants, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Garen, Clark, against Fernandez, Luis, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions313 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time313 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction 234110-Satisfaction Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SATISFACTION [234110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney 214810-Substitution of Attorney Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY [214810] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.