Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case against Louise C Lynch, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time169 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 24, 2018SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 24, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 31, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 13, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: June 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Clerk stamp |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Military Investigation | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215(g) |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - a invoice |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.