Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Michael J. Fox, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bartolomei, John P., against Does 1 Through 50, Duke, Holzman, Photiadis & Gresens, Llp, Robert Bencini Esq., represented by Auletta, Hedwig Maria, Gaughan, John Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Professional Malpractice (Legal Malpractice) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: May 14, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: May 14, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1)
Date: February 27, 2017MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
December 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
October 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
August 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
July 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of 5.14.20 Order | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) | |
March 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.