Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Delreta Billips, Homer Billips, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lovecchio, Michael Joseph, against Melissa M Lassman, Paris A Ventry, represented by Burgio, James Philip, Emminger, Rachel A., in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 14, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: February 11, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 23, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 23, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 14, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 14, 2019ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: July 31, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 29, 2019STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: March 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Index to Exhibits |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Transcript Excerpts |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Transcript excerpts |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Photographs |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Google Map Overview |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Police Report |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Partial Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Verified Bill of Particulars |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.