Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ditech Financial Llc Fka Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bussi, Nicholas C., Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Strauss, Laura Marie, against John Doe, Kara Kiebzak Aka Kara M. Kiebzak, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time392 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | |
June 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification
Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
May 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
March 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
December 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Kara Kiebzak 3215 aff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.